+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On August 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted 058-000-016
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted 058-000-011
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund to the Department of Transportation for specified purposes. Provides that the appropriation authority is valid only for costs incurred July 1, 2015 through September 30, 2015. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Makes an appropriation from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for grants associated with child care services, including operating and administrative costs.