+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0705
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 8, 2008
On November 9, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On October 12, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On October 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 12, 2007
- Second Reading
On October 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
- Waive Posting Notice
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading October 11, 2007
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
On October 4, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On October 3, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 5, 2007
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 021-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On October 2, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
October 12, 2007: HB4148 - Third Reading - Friday, October 12, 2007
October 4, 2007: HB4148 - Third Reading - Thursday, October 04, 2007
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor