+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 7, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0713
- Effective Date July 1, 2008
- Governor Certifies Changes
On April 4, 2008 in the House:
- Returned to Governor for Certification
- Sent to the Governor
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Both Houses Accepted Amendatory Veto
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Accept Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 050-001-000
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations I; 009-002-000
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Appropriations I
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto March 5, 2008
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Accept Amendatory Veto - House Passed 111-001-000
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000; Motion #2
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Esther Golar; Motion #2
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Esther Golar; Motion #1
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto February 14, 2008
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On November 9, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On October 12, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On October 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 12, 2007
On October 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
- Sponsor Removed Sen. David Koehler
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading October 11, 2007
- Do Pass Appropriations I; 008-001-000
- Waive Posting Notice
- Assigned to Appropriations I
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On October 4, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On October 3, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 5, 2007
On September 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On September 26, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2008: HB4144 - Motion - Thursday, March 06, 2008
February 20, 2008: HB4144 - Motion - Wednesday, February 20, 2008
October 12, 2007: HB4144 - Third Reading - Friday, October 12, 2007
October 4, 2007: HB4144 - Third Reading - Thursday, October 04, 2007
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor