+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 11, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0905
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
On June 17, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 111-006-000
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Terry R. Parke
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Collins
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Judiciary; 007-000-000
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Judiciary
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Judiciary
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terry R. Parke
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2004: SFA0002 - Concurrence - Wednesday, May 19, 2004
May 13, 2004: HB4135 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 13, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB4135 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor