+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On September 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On August 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act
- 750 ILCS 46/802
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor