+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John O. Jones
On May 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2008
- Second Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson
On May 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2008
- Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Local Government
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-032-000
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 008-002-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On August 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/8-8-3 - from Ch. 24, par. 8-8-3
+ − Vote
April 9, 2008: HB4132 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 09, 2008
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor