+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 020-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to provide that a truck may be used to transport students to school related instructional programs if the students are within the truck's passenger compartment and the number of students in the truck does not exceed the number of actual seats within the passenger compartment. Provides that a school board that authorizes a truck to transport students to a school related instructional program shall accept liability for any resulting injury or damage. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1414.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-1414.1