+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 10, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 10, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1059
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 014-000-000
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2022
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
- Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On September 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Specifies that the maximum scholarship amount set by a qualified school is subject to the limitations provided under existing law.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (8)
April 7, 2022: SCA0001 - Concurrence
April 6, 2022: SCA0001 - Executive
April 1, 2022: HB4126 - Third Reading
March 30, 2022: HB4126 - Executive
March 30, 2022: SCA0001 - Executive
March 2, 2022: HB4126 - Third Reading
February 17, 2022: HB4126 - Revenue & Finance
February 17, 2022: HB4126 - Income Tax Subcommittee
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor