+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 9, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0694
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 9, 2004
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-001
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 28, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-001
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Defines athletic facility.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-3
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB4120 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 24, 2004: HB4120 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 24, 2004
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor