+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 105/20 - from Ch. 38, par. 1670
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor