+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022
- Arrive in Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-000-001
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On September 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/3-405.2 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-405.2
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2022: HB4105
February 15, 2022: HB4105 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor