+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-045-000
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue Committee; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue Committee
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J Verschoore
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue Committee; 003-000-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule April 30, 2007
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J Verschoore
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: In the Counties Code, makes changes to the administration and collection of the occupation tax. Requires that the tax proceeds be distributed to regional superintendents of schools in counties from which the taxes were paid (instead of being distributed to the county). Amends the School Code. Sets forth procedures for regional superintendents of schools to distribute the tax proceeds to school districts on a per-pupil basis. Requires school districts to deposit the proceeds in a special school facility occupation tax fund and use those moneys only for school-facility purposes. Prohibits school district from issuing certain bonds or imposing certain taxes for health and safety purposes if moneys remain in the school facility occupation tax fund. Sets forth procedures for school districts to issue revenue bonds to be repaid from the school facility occupation tax and provides that those bonds are not included in the districts' debt limitation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: In the Counties Code, makes changes to the administration and collection of the occupation tax. Requires that the tax proceeds be distributed to regional superintendents of schools in counties from which the taxes were paid (instead of being distributed to the county). Amends the School Code. Sets forth procedures for regional superintendents of schools to distribute the tax proceeds to school districts on a per-pupil basis. Requires school districts to deposit the proceeds in a special school facility occupation tax fund and use those moneys only for school-facility purposes. Prohibits school district from issuing certain bonds or imposing certain taxes for health and safety purposes if moneys remain in the school facility occupation tax fund. Sets forth procedures for school districts to issue revenue bonds to be repaid from the school facility occupation tax and provides that those bonds are not included in the districts' debt limitation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.