+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
- Motion Prevailed
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Motion Filed Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz; Table House Bill 41Pursuant to Rule 60(b)
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 15, 2004 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/4-108 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 4-108
- 30 ILCS 805/8.29 new -