+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 002-003-000; Lost
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 135/2 - from Ch. 134, par. 16.5
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor