+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor