+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -