+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 17, 2012 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0977
- Effective Date August 17, 2012
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2012 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2012 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-004-001
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2012
- Second Reading
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012
- Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-000
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 009-001-000
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters