+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/7-172 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-172
- 30 ILCS 805/8.44 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor