+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Rutherford
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ronald A. Wait
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with these changes. Exempts from prosecution for violations of the Act minors who purchase or posses tobacco pursuant to a "sting operation" or enforcement action against persons who illegally furnish tobacco to minors. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 705 ILCS 405/5-615 -
- 705 ILCS 405/5-710 -
- 720 ILCS 675/Act title -
- 720 ILCS 675/0.01 - from Ch. 23, par. 2356.9
- 720 ILCS 675/1 - from Ch. 23, par. 2357
- 720 ILCS 675/2 - from Ch. 23, par. 2358
+ − Vote
March 25, 2004: HB4067 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor