+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that forensic pathologists (currently, pathologists) shall be appointed to the Coroner Training Board. Provides that the Board shall consult with the Illinois Coroners and Medical Examiners Association when adopting mandatory minimum standards for coroners. Expands the location of coroner training schools. Provides that the Board can develop a waiver process for lead investigator of coroner investigations for coroners with prior experience. Further provides that a Section of the Illinois Police Training Act does not impede the powers of a coroner to investigate deaths.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- New Act -
- 50 ILCS 705/1 - from Ch. 85, par. 501
- 50 ILCS 705/10.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/3-3001 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-3001
- 410 ILCS 535/25.5 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2015: HB4054 - Business Occupational Licenses - Mar 25, 2015
March 25, 2015: HCA0001 - Business Occupational Licenses - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor