+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 55 ILCS 5/3-9005 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-9005
- 705 ILCS 405/2-35 new -
- 750 ILCS 5/603.9 new -
- 750 ILCS 46/808.1 new -
- 755 ILCS 5/11-7.2 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor