+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Grade A Pasteurized Milk and Milk Products Act. Deletes language that exempts milk produced in accordance with Department of Public Health rules from pasteurization requirements if the milk is sold or distributed on the premises of a dairy farm.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 410 ILCS 39/1 -
- 410 ILCS 635/8 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 2208
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor