+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/3-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-6