+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 20, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0768
- Effective Date July 20, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Correctional Note Filed Corrections Budget and Impact Note as Engrossed from the Illinois Department of Corrections.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2004
- Second Reading
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/5-8-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-8-4
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB4032 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 23, 2004: HB4032 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 23, 2004
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor