+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 6, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0684
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-007-004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On May 17, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Delgado
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Judiciary; 007-000-000
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Correctional Note Filed and Impact Note from the Illinois Department of Corrections.
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-002
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Restores language providing that no report made within the time limit may be used as a basis for a prosecution for failing to remain at the accident scene.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-401 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-401
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2004: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, May 19, 2004
May 13, 2004: HB4027 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 13, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB4027 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor