+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-001-000
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-001-000
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- To Civil Procedure Subcommittee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/9-107 - from Ch. 110, par. 9-107
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2020: HB4025 - Third Reading
February 19, 2020: HB4025 - Civil Procedure Subcommittee
February 19, 2020: HB4025 - Judiciary - Civil
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor