+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Churchill
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert W. Churchill
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia Bailey
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
- Assigned to Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lee A. Daniels
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires that the program be one of support services, rather than financial assistance.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 31, 2004: HB4019 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 31, 2004
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor