+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act