+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-003-000
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Compulsory Attendance of Pupils Article of the School Code. Provides that a child may be absent from a public school because of religious reasons, including the observance of a religious holiday or participation in religious instruction. Removes the provision that requires a school board to prescribe rules relative to absences for religious holidays, including a list of religious holidays on which it shall be mandatory to excuse a child's absence. Provides instead that a district superintendent shall develop and distribute to schools appropriate procedures with regard to an absence.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/26-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 26-1
- 105 ILCS 5/26-2b - from Ch. 122, par. 26-2b
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2020: HFA0001 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
February 5, 2020: HB4011 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor