+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-9.1
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2020: HB4007 - Third Reading
February 19, 2020: HB4007 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor