+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption Reform; 008-000-000
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Adoption Reform
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Statute Amended
- 325 ILCS 5/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 2053