+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 043-068-006
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-001-000
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Correctional Note Filed
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Judicial Note Filed
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-002-000
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 30 ILCS 105/5.620 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/2-119 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 2-119
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-106
- 625 ILCS 5/6-107.4 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/6-107.5 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/6-118 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-118
+ − Vote
March 31, 2004: HB4003 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 31, 2004
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor