+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 40 ILCS 5/6-210.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-210.1
- 40 ILCS 5/6-210.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/8-172 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 8-172
- 40 ILCS 5/8-172.1 new -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor