+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 28, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0172
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-009-003
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-001-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/14-1.02 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-1.02
+ − Votes (4)
May 28, 2021: HB0040 - Third Reading
May 11, 2021: HB0040 - Education
April 14, 2021: HB0040 - Third Reading
March 2, 2021: HB0040 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor