+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (66)
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0538
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
- Governor Approved
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
On September 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion Withdrawn Sen. Don Harmon
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Don Harmon
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-022-000
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-004-000
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-055-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 061-055-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 061-054-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Judicial Note Filed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Judicial Note Filed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 20, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Further amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of the Code, reproductive health care that is otherwise legal in Illinois shall be covered under the medical assistance program for persons who are otherwise eligible for medical assistance.
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 5 ILCS 375/6 - from Ch. 127, par. 526
- 5 ILCS 375/6.1 - from Ch. 127, par. 526.1
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-5
- 305 ILCS 5/5-8 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-8
- 305 ILCS 5/5-9 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-9
- 305 ILCS 5/6-1 - from Ch. 23, par. 6-1
- 410 ILCS 230/4-100 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4604-100
- 720 ILCS 510/1 - from Ch. 38, par. 81-21
+ − Votes (6)
May 10, 2017: HB0040 - Third Reading
May 9, 2017: HB0040 - Human Services
April 25, 2017: HB0040 - Motion
April 25, 2017: HB0040 - Motion
April 25, 2017: HB0040 - Third Reading
February 8, 2017: HB0040 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor