+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-5
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor