+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 505/1.1 - from Ch. 23, par. 5001.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor