+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 011-000-000
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lovana Jones
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan