+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor