+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor