+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0909
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 12, 2004
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Careen Gordon
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the School Code, and Juvenile Court Act of 1987 with respect to criminal background investigations of applicants for employment with a school district. Changes references from criminal background investigation to criminal history records check. Provides that the school district or regional superintendent of schools shall submit an applicant's fingerprint images or other identifiers to the State Police when requesting a check. Provides for the State Police and FBI to furnish fingerprint-based criminal history records checks and records of convictions, until expunged (now, the State Police do a 7-year felony search). Provides that, subject to appropriation, the State Superintendent of Education shall reimburse schools districts and regional superintendents for fees paid to obtain checks. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-325 - was 20 ILCS 2605/55a in part
- 105 ILCS 5/10-21.9 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-21.9
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18.5 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-18.5
- 30 ILCS 805/8.28 new -