+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 002-012-000
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 765 ILCS 605/22 - from Ch. 30, par. 322
- 765 ILCS 605/22.1 - from Ch. 30, par. 322.1
- 765 ILCS 605/24.5 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor