+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/25-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 25-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor