+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Remains in Insurance Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance Committee; 006-011-000
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 215 ILCS 5/355 - from Ch. 73, par. 967
- 215 ILCS 5/355.01 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/367 - from Ch. 73, par. 979
- 215 ILCS 125/2-11.1 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2