+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/6-128 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-128
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor