+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 14, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0524
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2010
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-008-000
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Transportation; 006-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John M. Sullivan
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-035-000
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-005-001
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/11-601 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-601
- 625 ILCS 5/11-602 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-602
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2009: HB3956 - Third Reading - Monday, May 18, 2009
March 26, 2009: HB3956 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 26, 2009
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor