+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 16, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0602
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 16, 2005
On June 27, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 25, 2005 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Watson
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Watson
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On May 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Revenue; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Revenue; 007-000-000
On May 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
On May 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Frank C. Watson
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2005
- Second Reading
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Frank C. Watson
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2005
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 012-000-000
- Remains in Revenue Committee
- Recommends Be Adopted Sub-committee/ Revenue Committee; 003-000-000
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Adds the Blindness Prevention Fund to the list of other tax checkoff funds monitored by the Department of Revenue.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20 ILCS 2310/2310-612 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.640 new -
- 35 ILCS 5/507EE new -
- 35 ILCS 5/509 - from Ch. 120, par. 5-509
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2005: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 29, 2005
May 19, 2005: HB0395 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 19, 2005
April 5, 2005: HB0395 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 05, 2005
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor