+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 35 ILCS 105/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.2
- 35 ILCS 120/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 440
- 625 ILCS 5/3-1001 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-1001
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor