+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 045-059-001
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 009-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 29, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 concerning eavesdropping exemptions. Provides that a person who is not a law enforcement officer nor acting at the direction of a law enforcement officer may record the conversation of a law enforcement officer who is performing a public duty in a public place and any other person who is having a conversation with that law enforcement officer if the conversation is at a volume audible to the unassisted ear of the person who is making the recording. Defines "public place". Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 21, 2012: HB3944 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 21, 2012
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor