+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 225 ILCS 65/55-10 - was 225 ILCS 65/10-30
- 225 ILCS 65/55-11 -
- 225 ILCS 65/60-10 -
- 225 ILCS 65/60-11 -
- 225 ILCS 65/65-5 - was 225 ILCS 65/15-10
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor